Skip to main content

If 11 × 11 = 4, 22 × 22 = 16, 33 × 33 = 36, and 44 x 44=64, then what is the value of 55 × 55?

Answer is 100.. just a different pattern.
(aa)×(aa)= (a+a)^(number of times the value a is repeated in the second bracket)
implied,
(11)×(11)= (1+1)^2=4
(22)×(22)=(2+2)^2=16
(33)×(33)=(3+3)^2=36
(44)×(44)=(4+4)^2=64
likewise,
(55)×(55)=(5+5)^2=100

Comments

Random Topics

Popular posts from this blog